FL H0349 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Criminal Justice Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Criminal Justice Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Specifies that certain information retained by Criminal Justice Information Program relating to juvenile offenders is exempt from public records requirements; removes exemption from public records requirements for certain information relating to juvenile offenders; provides for future legislative review & repeal of exemptions; provides statement of public necessity.
Title
Pub. Rec./Juvenile Offenders
Sponsors
Rep. Al Jacquet [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-10 | House | Died in Criminal Justice Subcommittee |
2018-03-10 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2018-01-09 | House | Introduced |
2017-10-26 | House | Referred to Criminal Justice Subcommittee; Oversight, Transparency and Administration Subcommittee; Judiciary Committee |
2017-10-16 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S598 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Criminal Justice
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
943 | 0515 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
943 | 053 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/349 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/349/BillText/Filed/PDF |