FL H0347 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 37-15)
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Careers and Competition Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Provides that sexual orientation & gender identity are impermissible grounds for discrimination in public lodging establishments & public food service establishments; revises provisions of Florida Civil Rights Act of 1992 and Fair Housing Act to include sexual orientation & gender identity; provides exception for constitutionally protected free exercise of religion.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Prohibited Discrimination

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-10HouseDied in Careers and Competition Subcommittee
2018-03-10HouseIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2018-01-09HouseIntroduced
2017-10-26HouseReferred to Careers and Competition Subcommittee; Judiciary Committee; Commerce Committee
2017-10-16HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S66 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Governmental Oversight and Accountability
S698 (Similar To) 2017-11-01 - Withdrawn prior to introduction

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
419001Amended CodeSee Bill Text
509092Amended CodeSee Bill Text
76001Amended CodeSee Bill Text
76002Amended CodeSee Bill Text
76005Amended CodeSee Bill Text
76007Amended CodeSee Bill Text
76008Amended CodeSee Bill Text
76010Amended CodeSee Bill Text
76022Amended CodeSee Bill Text
76023Amended CodeSee Bill Text
76024Amended CodeSee Bill Text
76025Amended CodeSee Bill Text
76026Amended CodeSee Bill Text
76029Amended CodeSee Bill Text
76060Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback