FL H0345 | 2011 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Designates act "Lambourg Keep Families United Act"; requires photographs & reports of child visitations; provides that unmarried biological father is not relative for specified program; revises provisions concerning effect of unfavorable home study on placement of child; requires that permanency hearing be timed so child will achieve permanency within 12 months; revises preference of permanency goals; provides consequences for failure of children to achieve permanency within specified period, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Child Welfare

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2011-05-07 Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2011-03-08 Introduced -HJ 34
2011-02-07 Referred to HHS Access Subcommittee; Civil Justice Subcommittee; Appropriations Committee; Health and Human Services Committee -HJ 34
2011-01-24 Filed

Same As/Similar To

S0878 () 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
390136Amended CodeSee Bill Text
395085Amended CodeSee Bill Text
39521Amended CodeSee Bill Text
39621Amended CodeSee Bill Text
39801Amended CodeSee Bill Text
39803Amended CodeSee Bill Text
39809Amended CodeSee Bill Text
39812Amended CodeSee Bill Text
39816Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback