FL H0343 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Careers and Competition Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Provides exemption from public records requirements for certain application information submitted to Florida Motion Picture Capital Corporation; provides for legislative review & repeal of exemption; provides public necessity statement.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Pub. Rec./Florida Motion Picture Capital Corporation

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-10HouseDied in Careers and Competition Subcommittee
2018-03-10HouseIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2018-01-09HouseIntroduced
2017-10-26HouseReferred to Careers and Competition Subcommittee; Oversight, Transparency and Administration Subcommittee; Commerce Committee
2017-10-16HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

H341 (Related) 2018-03-10 - Died in Careers and Competition Subcommittee
S1604 (Same As) 2018-03-10 - Died in Governmental Oversight and Accountability
S1606 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
2881259Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback