FL H0341 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Careers and Competition Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Establishes Florida Motion Picture Capital Corporation; requires board to adopt specified criteria for evaluating financing applications; requires board to give preference to productions that meet specified criteria; specifies composition of corporation's board of directors; authorizes creation of Florida Motion Picture Capital Account; provides for appointment of corporation's president; requires corporation to provide certain notice of financing contracts or agreements.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Film and Television Production

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-10HouseDied in Careers and Competition Subcommittee
2018-03-10HouseIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2018-01-09HouseIntroduced
2017-10-26HouseReferred to Careers and Competition Subcommittee; Appropriations Committee; Commerce Committee
2017-10-16HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

H343 (Related) 2018-03-10 - Died in Careers and Competition Subcommittee
S1606 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development
S1604 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Governmental Oversight and Accountability

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
2881259Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback