FL H0337 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (? 2-1)
Status: Introduced on October 18 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-14 - Died on Second Reading Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on October 18 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-14 - Died on Second Reading Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Provides requirements for certain notices; provides requirements for material incorporated by reference; revises circumstances under which proposed rule's adverse impact on small businesses is considered to exist; revises requirements for agency's consideration of lower cost regulatory alternative; provides requirements for Florida Administrative Code & Florida Administrative Register; provides requirements for agency's regulatory plan.
Title
Administrative Procedures
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-23 - House - House State Affairs Committee (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-23 - House - House State Affairs Committee (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-01-31 - House - House Appropriations Committee (Y: 18 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2022-01-12 - House - House Government Operations Subcommittee (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-23 - House - House State Affairs Committee (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-01-31 - House - House Appropriations Committee (Y: 18 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2022-01-12 - House - House Government Operations Subcommittee (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-14 | House | Died on Second Reading Calendar |
2022-03-12 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2022-03-01 | House | Added to Second Reading Calendar |
2022-03-01 | House | Temporarily postponed, on 2nd Reading |
2022-02-24 | House | 1st Reading (Committee Substitute 2) |
2022-02-24 | House | Bill added to Special Order Calendar (3/1/2022) |
2022-02-24 | House | Bill referred to House Calendar |
2022-02-24 | House | CS Filed |
2022-02-24 | House | Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a) |
2022-02-24 | House | Reported out of State Affairs Committee |
2022-02-23 | House | Favorable with CS by State Affairs Committee |
2022-02-21 | House | Added to State Affairs Committee agenda |
2022-02-04 | House | Added to State Affairs Committee agenda |
2022-02-01 | House | Now in State Affairs Committee |
2022-02-01 | House | Reported out of Appropriations Committee |
2022-01-31 | House | Favorable by Appropriations Committee |
2022-01-27 | House | Added to Appropriations Committee agenda |
2022-01-18 | House | Now in Appropriations Committee |
2022-01-18 | House | Referred to State Affairs Committee |
2022-01-18 | House | Referred to Appropriations Committee |
2022-01-18 | House | 1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1) |
2022-01-14 | House | CS Filed |
2022-01-14 | House | Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a) |
2022-01-12 | House | Reported out of Government Operations Subcommittee |
2022-01-12 | House | Favorable with CS by Government Operations Subcommittee |
2022-01-11 | House | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) |
2022-01-10 | House | Added to Government Operations Subcommittee agenda |
2021-11-05 | House | Now in Government Operations Subcommittee |
2021-11-05 | House | Referred to State Affairs Committee |
2021-11-05 | House | Referred to Appropriations Committee |
2021-11-05 | House | Referred to Government Operations Subcommittee |
2021-10-18 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S536 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Died in Messages
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
120 | 52 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
120 | 54 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
120 | 541 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
120 | 545 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
120 | 55 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
120 | 74 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |