FL H0335 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 15-6-1)
Status: Introduced on October 13 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-14 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/CS/SB 140
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Provides requirements for issuance of marriage license to persons under age of 18 years but at least 16 years of age; revises circumstances in which parental consent is not required; provides that persons under age of 16 years may not be issued marriage license.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Marriage of Minors

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-02-14HouseLaid on Table, refer to CS/CS/SB 140
2018-02-14HouseSubstituted CS/CS/SB 140
2018-02-08HousePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 02/14/18
2018-02-05HousePlaced on Calendar
2018-02-02HouseCS by Judiciary Committee read 1st time
2018-02-02HousePending review of CS -under Rule 7.18(c)
2018-02-01HouseCS by- Judiciary Committee; YEAS 17 NAYS 2
2018-01-30HouseOn Committee agenda-- Judiciary Committee, 02/01/18, 8:00 am, Sumner Hall
2018-01-09HouseIntroduced
2017-11-09HouseNow in Judiciary Committee
2017-11-08HouseFavorable by Civil Justice and Claims Subcommittee; YEAS 13 NAYS 1
2017-11-01HouseOn Committee agenda-- Civil Justice and Claims Subcommittee, 11/08/17, 1:30 pm, Sumner Hall
2017-10-26HouseReferred to Civil Justice and Claims Subcommittee; Judiciary Committee
2017-10-13HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S140 (Same As) 2018-03-26 - Chapter No. 2018-81
H71 (Similar To) 2017-11-02 - Withdrawn prior to introduction
S208 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Judiciary

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
74104Amended CodeSee Bill Text
7410405Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback