FL H0333 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 24 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-24 - Chapter No. 2020-83
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 24 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-24 - Chapter No. 2020-83
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibits bail to specified offenders pending review following conviction for offense requiring sexual offender or sexual predator registration if victim was minor.
Title
Bail Pending Appellate Review
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-06 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#26 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#484 (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#484 (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-24 | Chapter No. 2020-83 | |
2020-06-23 | Approved by Governor | |
2020-06-16 | Signed by Officers and presented to Governor | |
2020-03-06 | House | Ordered enrolled |
2020-03-06 | Senate | CS passed; YEAS 39 NAYS 0 |
2020-03-06 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Placed on 3rd reading |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Substituted for SB 510 |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Withdrawn from Criminal Justice; Judiciary; Rules |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Received |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Referred to Criminal Justice; Judiciary; Rules |
2020-03-03 | Senate | In Messages |
2020-02-26 | House | CS passed; YEAS 115 NAYS 0 |
2020-02-26 | House | Read 3rd time |
2020-02-26 | House | Read 2nd time |
2020-02-20 | House | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 02/26/20 |
2020-02-13 | House | CS by Judiciary Committee read 1st time |
2020-02-13 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2020-02-12 | House | Pending review of CS -under Rule 7.18(c) |
2020-02-12 | House | CS by- Judiciary Committee; YEAS 13 NAYS 0 |
2020-02-10 | House | On Committee agenda-- Judiciary Committee, 02/12/20, 10:00 am, Sumner Hall |
2020-02-04 | House | Now in Judiciary Committee |
2020-02-04 | House | Favorable by Justice Appropriations Subcommittee; YEAS 9 NAYS 0 |
2020-01-31 | House | On Committee agenda-- Justice Appropriations Subcommittee, 02/04/20, 9:00 am, Morris Hall |
2020-01-16 | House | Now in Justice Appropriations Subcommittee |
2020-01-15 | House | Favorable by Criminal Justice Subcommittee; YEAS 12 NAYS 0 |
2020-01-14 | House | Introduced |
2020-01-13 | House | On Committee agenda-- Criminal Justice Subcommittee, 01/15/20, 9:30 am, Sumner Hall |
2019-10-16 | House | Referred to Criminal Justice Subcommittee; Justice Appropriations Subcommittee; Judiciary Committee |
2019-10-10 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S510 (Same As) 2020-03-05 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/HB 333