FL H0329 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on October 10 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-03-10 - Laid on Table - Companion bill(s) SB 540 passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Authorizes employee of Florida Insurance Guaranty Association or employee of guaranty association of another state to adjust losses for Florida Insurance Guaranty Association if certain conditions are met; revises calculation of insurers' initial payments to association; revises requirements for OIR in levying workers' compensation insurers; provides that insurer's direct written premium may not be reduced by certain amounts for purposes of determining insurer assessments or policyholder surcharges; revises requirements for remitting policy surcharges & assessments; provides that assessments paid by insurers constitute advances of funds to Florida Workers' Compensation Insurance Guaranty Association.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Insurance Guaranty Associations

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-10HouseLaid on Table - Companion bill(s) SB 540 passed
2020-01-17HousePlaced on Calendar
2020-01-16HouseFavorable by- Commerce Committee; YEAS 22 NAYS 0
2020-01-14HouseIntroduced
2020-01-14HouseOn Committee agenda-- Commerce Committee, 01/16/20, 2:30 pm, Webster Hall
2019-12-12HouseNow in Commerce Committee
2019-12-11HouseFavorable by Government Operations and Technology Appropriations Subcommittee; YEAS 8 NAYS 0
2019-12-05HouseOn Committee agenda-- Government Operations and Technology Appropriations Subcommittee, 12/12/19, 4:00 pm, Morris Hall -- Meeting Cancelled
2019-12-04HouseOn Committee agenda-- Government Operations and Technology Appropriations Subcommittee, 12/11/19, 12:30 pm, Morris Hall
2019-11-06HouseNow in Government Operations and Technology Appropriations Subcommittee
2019-11-06HouseFavorable by Insurance and Banking Subcommittee; YEAS 14 NAYS 0
2019-10-30HouseOn Committee agenda-- Insurance and Banking Subcommittee, 11/06/19, 3:30 pm, Sumner Hall
2019-10-16HouseReferred to Insurance and Banking Subcommittee; Government Operations and Technology Appropriations Subcommittee; Commerce Committee
2019-10-10HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S540 (Same As) 2020-06-22 - Chapter No. 2020-54

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
625012Amended CodeSee Bill Text
6268621Amended CodeSee Bill Text
63154Amended CodeSee Bill Text
63157Amended CodeSee Bill Text
63159Amended CodeSee Bill Text
631912Amended CodeSee Bill Text
631914Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback