FL H0329 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-02-13 - On Committee agenda-- Health Quality Subcommittee, 02/20/19, 4:00 pm, Mashburn Hall
Pending: House Health Quality Subcommittee Committee
Hearing: Feb 20 @ 4:00 pm in Mashburn Hall
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Repeals provisions relating to Electrolysis Council; provides certification requirements for licensed electrologists who perform laser hair removal or reduction.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Laser Hair Removal or Reduction

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-13HouseOn Committee agenda-- Health Quality Subcommittee, 02/20/19, 4:00 pm, Mashburn Hall
2019-01-23HouseReferred to Health Quality Subcommittee; Business and Professions Subcommittee; Health and Human Services Committee
2019-01-17HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S570 (Same As) 2019-02-08 - Referred to Health Policy; Innovation, Industry, and Technology; Rules

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
47842Amended CodeSee Bill Text
47843Amended CodeSee Bill Text
47844Amended CodeSee Bill Text
47845Amended CodeSee Bill Text
47849Amended CodeSee Bill Text
47850Amended CodeSee Bill Text
47852Amended CodeSee Bill Text
47853Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback