FL H0329 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 3 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-03 - Chapter No. 2015-91
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 3 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-03 - Chapter No. 2015-91
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing the Department of Highway Safety and Motor Vehicles to issue Woman Veteran, World War II Veteran, Navy Submariner, Combat Action Ribbon, Air Force Combat Action Medal, and Distinguished Flying Cross license plates; specifying qualifications and requirements for the plates; requiring that any revenue generated from the sale of Woman Veteran license plates be deposited into the Operations and Maintenance Trust Fund to be used for certain purposes, etc.
Title
Special License Plates
Sponsors
House Economic Affairs Committee | House Highway and Waterway Safety Subcommittee | Rep. Clay Ingram [R] | Sen. Ben Albritton [R] |
Rep. Larry Metz [R] | Rep. Michelle Rehwinkel Vasilinda [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-04-24 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#260 (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-23 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#13 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-09 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#114 (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-23 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#13 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-09 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#114 (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-03 | Chapter No. 2015-91 | |
2015-06-02 | Approved by Governor | |
2015-05-18 | Signed by Officers and presented to Governor | |
2015-04-24 | House | Ordered engrossed, then enrolled |
2015-04-24 | House | CS passed as amended; YEAS 116 NAYS 0 |
2015-04-24 | House | Concurred in 1 amendment(s) (201480) |
2015-04-23 | House | In returning messages |
2015-04-23 | Senate | CS passed as amended; YEAS 37 NAYS 0 |
2015-04-23 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Placed on 3rd reading |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Amendment(s) adopted (201480) |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Substituted for CS/CS/SB 112 |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Withdrawn from Military and Veterans Affairs, Space, and Domestic Security; Transportation; Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development; Fiscal Policy |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Received |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Referred to Military and Veterans Affairs, Space, and Domestic Security; Transportation; Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development; Fiscal Policy |
2015-04-15 | Senate | In Messages |
2015-04-09 | House | CS passed; YEAS 115 NAYS 0 |
2015-04-09 | House | Read 3rd time |
2015-04-08 | House | Placed on 3rd reading |
2015-04-08 | House | Read 2nd time |
2015-04-06 | House | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/08/15 |
2015-03-16 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2015-03-13 | House | CS/CS by Economic Affairs Committee read 1st time |
2015-03-13 | House | Pending review of CS -under Rule 7.19(c) |
2015-03-11 | House | CS/CS by- Economic Affairs Committee; YEAS 14 NAYS 0 |
2015-03-09 | House | On Committee agenda-- Economic Affairs Committee, 03/11/15, 1:00 pm, Reed Hall |
2015-03-04 | House | Now in Economic Affairs Committee |
2015-03-04 | House | Favorable by Transportation and Economic Development Appropriations Subcommittee; YEAS 13 NAYS 0 |
2015-03-03 | House | CS by Highway and Waterway Safety Subcommittee read 1st time |
2015-03-03 | House | Introduced |
2015-03-02 | House | On Committee agenda-- Transportation and Economic Development Appropriations Subcommittee, 03/04/15, 9:00 am, Reed Hall |
2015-02-24 | House | Now in Transportation and Economic Development Appropriations Subcommittee |
2015-02-23 | House | Pending review of CS under Rule 7.19(c) |
2015-02-17 | House | CS by Highway and Waterway Safety Subcommittee; YEAS 11 NAYS 0 |
2015-02-10 | House | On Committee agenda-- Highway and Waterway Safety Subcommittee, 02/17/15, 9:00 am, 116 Knott Building |
2015-01-28 | House | Referred to Highway and Waterway Safety Subcommittee; Transportation and Economic Development Appropriations Subcommittee; Economic Affairs Committee |
2015-01-19 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S0112 (Same As) 2015-04-22 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 329 (Ch. 2015-91)