FL H0327 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 22 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-22 - Chapter No. 2020-66
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Provides that person commits specified violations for illegal taking, possession, & sale of bears; prohibits illegal taking, possession, & sale of bears; provides penalties.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Illegal Taking, Possession, and Sale of Bears

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-12 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#741 (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-11 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#15 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#415 (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-06-22 Chapter No. 2020-66
2020-06-20 Approved by Governor
2020-06-11 Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
2020-03-12HouseOrdered engrossed, then enrolled
2020-03-12HouseCS passed as amended; YEAS 114 NAYS 0
2020-03-12HouseConcurred in 1 amendment(s) (686766)
2020-03-11HouseIn returning messages
2020-03-11SenateCS passed as amended; YEAS 40 NAYS 0
2020-03-11SenateRead 3rd time
2020-03-10SenatePlaced on 3rd reading
2020-03-10SenateAmendment(s) adopted (686766)
2020-03-10SenateRead 2nd time
2020-03-10SenateSubstituted for CS/CS/SB 688
2020-03-10SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2020-03-10SenateWithdrawn from Environment and Natural Resources; Criminal Justice; Rules
2020-02-13SenateReceived
2020-02-13SenateReferred to Environment and Natural Resources; Criminal Justice; Rules
2020-02-12SenateIn Messages
2020-02-05HouseCS passed; YEAS 116 NAYS 0
2020-02-05HouseRead 3rd time
2020-02-05HouseRead 2nd time
2020-01-30HousePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 02/05/20
2020-01-23HousePlaced on Calendar
2020-01-23HouseFavorable by- State Affairs Committee; YEAS 23 NAYS 0
2020-01-21HouseOn Committee agenda-- State Affairs Committee, 01/23/20, 9:30 am, Morris Hall
2020-01-15HouseNow in State Affairs Committee
2020-01-15HouseFavorable by Agriculture and Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee; YEAS 11 NAYS 0
2020-01-14HouseCS by Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee read 1st time
2020-01-14HouseIntroduced
2020-01-13HouseOn Committee agenda-- Agriculture and Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee, 01/15/20, 9:30 am, Morris Hall
2019-11-25HouseNow in Agriculture and Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee
2019-11-14HousePending review of CS under Rule 7.18(c)
2019-11-13HouseCS by Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee; YEAS 9 NAYS 0
2019-11-06HouseOn Committee agenda-- Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee, 11/13/19, 1:00 pm, 12 HOB
2019-10-16HouseReferred to Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee; Agriculture and Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee; State Affairs Committee
2019-10-10HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S688 (Same As) 2020-03-10 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/HB 327

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
379401Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3794041Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback