FL H0327 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 17 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-02-13 - On Committee agenda-- Energy and Utilities Subcommittee, 02/20/19, 4:00 pm, Webster Hall
Pending: House Energy And Utilities Subcommittee Committee
Hearing: Feb 20 @ 4:00 pm in Webster Hall
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Exempts from public meetings requirements certain exempt information concerning information technology systems held by specified utilities; provides for future legislative review & repeal of exemption; provides statement of public necessity.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Pub. Meetings/Local Government Electric Utility

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-13HouseOn Committee agenda-- Energy and Utilities Subcommittee, 02/20/19, 4:00 pm, Webster Hall
2019-01-23HouseReferred to Energy and Utilities Subcommittee; Oversight, Transparency and Public Management Subcommittee; Commerce Committee
2019-01-17HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S450 (Similar To) 2019-02-01 - Referred to Innovation, Industry, and Technology; Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Rules

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
2860113Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback