FL H0327 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 10-2-1)
Status: Passed on June 12 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-12 - Chapter No. 2017-79
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 10-2-1)
Status: Passed on June 12 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-12 - Chapter No. 2017-79
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Department of Agriculture and Consumer Services to deny or refuse to renew the registration of a mover or a moving broker under certain circumstances; prohibiting a mover or moving broker from knowingly refusing or failing to disclose in writing specified criminal information under certain circumstances; requiring the department to impose either a civil penalty or an administrative fine for failure to disclose in writing specified criminal information, etc.
Title
Household Movers and Moving Brokers
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-03 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#424 (Y: 119 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-02 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#28 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-23 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#26 (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-02 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#28 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-23 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#26 (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-12 | Chapter No. 2017-79 | |
2017-06-09 | Approved by Governor | |
2017-05-30 | Signed by Officers and presented to Governor | |
2017-05-03 | House | Ordered engrossed, then enrolled |
2017-05-03 | House | CS passed as amended; YEAS 119 NAYS 0 |
2017-05-03 | House | Concurred in 1 amendment(s) (941470) |
2017-05-02 | House | In returning messages |
2017-05-02 | Senate | CS passed as amended; YEAS 36 NAYS 0 |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2017-05-01 | Senate | Placed on 3rd reading |
2017-05-01 | Senate | Amendment(s) adopted (941470) |
2017-05-01 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2017-05-01 | Senate | Substituted for CS/CS/SB 336 |
2017-05-01 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2017-05-01 | Senate | Withdrawn from Regulated Industries; Appropriations Subcommittee on the Environment and Natural Resources; Appropriations |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Received |
2017-03-31 | Senate | Referred to Regulated Industries; Appropriations Subcommittee on the Environment and Natural Resources; Appropriations |
2017-03-29 | Senate | In Messages |
2017-03-23 | House | CS passed; YEAS 114 NAYS 0 |
2017-03-23 | House | Read 3rd time |
2017-03-22 | House | Placed on 3rd reading |
2017-03-22 | House | Read 2nd time |
2017-03-16 | House | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/22/17 |
2017-03-11 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2017-03-09 | House | Favorable by- Commerce Committee; YEAS 27 NAYS 0 |
2017-03-07 | House | CS by Careers and Competition Subcommittee read 1st time |
2017-03-07 | House | On Committee agenda-- Commerce Committee, 03/09/17, 8:30 am, Webster Hall |
2017-03-07 | House | Introduced |
2017-02-28 | House | Now in Commerce Committee |
2017-02-28 | House | CS referred to Commerce Committee |
2017-02-28 | House | Original reference(s) removed: Civil Justice and Claims Subcommittee |
2017-02-23 | House | Pending review of CS under Rule 7.18(c) |
2017-02-22 | House | CS by Careers and Competition Subcommittee; YEAS 12 NAYS 0 |
2017-02-15 | House | On Committee agenda-- Careers and Competition Subcommittee, 02/22/17, 1:15 pm, Webster Hall |
2017-02-06 | House | Referred to Careers and Competition Subcommittee; Civil Justice and Claims Subcommittee; Commerce Committee |
2017-01-20 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S0336 (Similar To) 2017-05-01 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 327 (Ch. 2017-79)
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
507 | 03 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
507 | 07 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
507 | 09 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
507 | 10 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |