FL H0325 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-1)
Status: Passed on June 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-25 - Chapter No. 2019-122
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Revises criteria DEP must use determining & assigning annual funding priorities for specified beach management & erosion control projects; specifies tiers for criteria; requires DEP to update active project lists on its website; requires funding for certain projects remain available for specified period; revises method in which DEP ranks & funds certain inlet management projects; revises requirements for comprehensive long-term management plan; requires DEP to submit 3-year work plan & related forecast for availability of funding to Legislature.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Coastal Management

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-24 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#11 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-17 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#183 (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-25 Chapter No. 2019-122
2019-06-24 Approved by Governor
2019-06-13 Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
2019-04-24HouseOrdered enrolled
2019-04-24SenateCS passed; YEAS 38 NAYS 0
2019-04-24SenateRead 3rd time
2019-04-24SenateRead 2nd time
2019-04-24SenateReceived
2019-04-24SenateSubstituted for SB 446
2019-04-24SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2019-04-24SenateWithdrawn from Environment and Natural Resources; Appropriations Subcommittee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government; Appropriations
2019-04-24SenateReferred to Environment and Natural Resources; Appropriations Subcommittee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government; Appropriations
2019-04-23SenateIn Messages
2019-04-17HouseCS passed; YEAS 113 NAYS 0
2019-04-17HouseRead 3rd time
2019-04-17HouseRead 2nd time 734
2019-04-11HousePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 04/17/19
2019-03-18HousePlaced on Calendar
2019-03-15HouseCS by State Affairs Committee read 1st time
2019-03-15HousePending review of CS -under Rule 7.18(c)
2019-03-14HouseCS by- State Affairs Committee; YEAS 22 NAYS 0
2019-03-12HouseOn Committee agenda-- State Affairs Committee, 03/14/19, 8:30 am, Morris Hall
2019-03-06HouseNow in State Affairs Committee
2019-03-05HouseFavorable by Agriculture and Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee; YEAS 8 NAYS 0
2019-03-05HouseIntroduced
2019-03-01HouseOn Committee agenda-- Agriculture and Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee, 03/05/19, 1:00 pm, Morris Hall
2019-02-21HouseNow in Agriculture and Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee
2019-02-21HouseFavorable by Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee; YEAS 10 NAYS 0
2019-02-14HouseOn Committee agenda-- Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee, 02/21/19, 10:30 am, 12 HOB
2019-01-23HouseReferred to Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee; Agriculture and Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee; State Affairs Committee
2019-01-17HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S446 (Similar To) 2019-04-24 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 325 (Ch. 2019-122)

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
161101Amended CodeSee Bill Text
161143Amended CodeSee Bill Text
161161Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback