FL H0325 | 2011 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 15 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-02 - Ordered enrolled -HJ 1162
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Provides fiduciary lawyer-client privilege; revises provisions relating to intestate share of surviving spouse; provides right to reform terms of will to correct mistakes or achieve tax objectives; provides for award of fees & costs in reformation & modification proceedings either against party's share in estate or in form of personal judgment against party individually; clarifies that revocation of will is subject to challenge on grounds of fraud, duress, mistake, or undue influence, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Estates

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2011-04-29 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#21 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-04-14 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#199 (Y: 119 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2011-05-02 Ordered enrolled -HJ 1162
2011-04-29 Withdrawn from Judiciary; Banking and Insurance; Rules -SJ 595
2011-04-28 Received -SJ 573
2011-04-27 Referred to Judiciary; Banking and Insurance; Rules -SJ 573
2011-04-15 In Messages
2011-04-14 Read 2nd time -HJ 632
2011-04-11 Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/14/11
2011-03-21 Placed on Calendar -HJ 265
2011-03-18 Pending review of CS -under Rule 7.19(c)
2011-03-17 CS by- Judiciary Committee; YEAS 16 NAYS 0 -HJ 261
2011-03-15 On Committee agenda-- Judiciary Committee, 03/17/11, 9:00 am, 404 HOB
2011-03-08 Introduced -HJ 32
2011-02-23 Favorable by Civil Justice Subcommittee; YEAS 15 NAYS 0 -HJ 151
2011-02-16 On Committee agenda-- Civil Justice Subcommittee, 02/23/11, 1:00 pm, 404 HOB
2011-02-01 Referred to Civil Justice Subcommittee; Judiciary Committee -HJ 32
2011-01-21 Filed

Same As/Similar To

S0648 () 2011-04-29 - Read 2nd time -SJ 595

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
732102Amended CodeSee Bill Text
7325165Amended CodeSee Bill Text
732518Amended CodeSee Bill Text
732615Amended CodeSee Bill Text
732616Amended CodeSee Bill Text
7331061Amended CodeSee Bill Text
733212Amended CodeSee Bill Text
7360201Amended CodeSee Bill Text
7360207Amended CodeSee Bill Text
7360406Amended CodeSee Bill Text
7360813Amended CodeSee Bill Text
744441Amended CodeSee Bill Text
905021Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback