FL H0323 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Failed on May 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-05 - Died in Government Accountability Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Failed on May 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-05 - Died in Government Accountability Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Directs DHSMV to develop Ronald Reagan license plate; establishes annual use fee for plate; provides for distribution & use of fees collected from sale of plates.
Title
Specialty License Plates
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-05 | House | Died in Government Accountability Committee |
2017-05-05 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2017-03-09 | House | Now in Government Accountability Committee |
2017-03-08 | House | Favorable by Transportation and Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee; YEAS 11 NAYS 0 |
2017-03-07 | House | Introduced |
2017-03-06 | House | On Committee agenda-- Transportation and Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee, 03/08/17, 8:00 am, 116 Knott Building |
2017-02-15 | House | Now in Transportation and Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee |
2017-02-15 | House | Favorable by Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee; YEAS 15 NAYS 0 |
2017-02-08 | House | On Committee agenda-- Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee, 02/15/17, 1:00 pm, Reed Hall |
2017-02-06 | House | Referred to Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee; Transportation and Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee; Government Accountability Committee |
2017-01-20 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S0284 (Similar To) 2017-05-05 - Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development
H1375 (Similar To) 2017-05-05 - Died in Transportation
H1375 (Similar To) 2017-05-05 - Died in Transportation
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
320 | 08056 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
320 | 08058 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2017/323 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2017/0323/BillText/Filed/PDF |