FL H0321 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Criminal Justice Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Defines "bump-fire stock"; prohibits importation, transfer or possession of bump-fire stock; authorizes person to relinquish bump-fire stock; requires person who does not relinquish bump-fire stock to destroy it.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Bump-fire Stocks

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-10HouseDied in Criminal Justice Subcommittee
2018-03-10HouseIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2018-01-09HouseIntroduced
2017-10-18HouseReferred to Criminal Justice Subcommittee; Justice Appropriations Subcommittee; Judiciary Committee
2017-10-12HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S456 (Same As) 2018-03-10 - Died in Judiciary
S7026 (Similar To) 2018-03-09 - Chapter No. 2018-3
H7101 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died on Calendar

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
79034Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback