FL H0319 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1-1)
Status: Passed on June 6 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-06 - Chapter No. 2023-195
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1-1)
Status: Passed on June 6 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-06 - Chapter No. 2023-195
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibits certain actions during covered sporting & entertainment events; prohibits profiting from violations; provides for seizure & forfeiture of specified assets.
Title
Interference With Sporting or Entertainment Events
Sponsors
House Criminal Justice Subcommittee | Rep. Taylor Yarkosky [R] | Rep. Jessica Baker [R] | Rep. Jervonte Edmonds [D] |
Rep. Tom Leek [R] | Rep. Alejandro Rizo [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-04-11 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#6 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-31 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#60 (Y: 109 N: 3 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-14 - House - House Judiciary Committee (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-02-23 - House - House Criminal Justice Subcommittee (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-03-31 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#60 (Y: 109 N: 3 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-14 - House - House Judiciary Committee (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-02-23 - House - House Criminal Justice Subcommittee (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-06 | Chapter No. 2023-195 | |
2023-06-05 | Approved by Governor | |
2023-05-23 | Signed by Officers and presented to Governor | |
2023-04-12 | House | Ordered enrolled |
2023-04-12 | House | In Messages |
2023-04-11 | Senate | CS passed; YEAS 39 NAYS 0 |
2023-04-11 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2023-04-11 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2023-04-11 | Senate | Substituted for CS/SB 764 |
2023-04-11 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2023-04-11 | Senate | Withdrawn from Rules |
2023-04-03 | Senate | Received |
2023-03-31 | Senate | Referred to Rules |
2023-03-31 | Senate | In Messages |
2023-03-31 | House | CS passed; YEAS 109, NAYS 3 |
2023-03-31 | House | Read 3rd time |
2023-03-30 | House | Added to Third Reading Calendar |
2023-03-30 | House | Placed on 3rd reading |
2023-03-30 | House | Read 2nd time |
2023-03-23 | House | Bill added to Special Order Calendar (3/30/2023) |
2023-03-14 | House | Added to Second Reading Calendar |
2023-03-14 | House | Bill released to House Calendar |
2023-03-14 | House | Reported out of Judiciary Committee |
2023-03-14 | House | Favorable by Judiciary Committee |
2023-03-10 | House | Added to Judiciary Committee agenda |
2023-03-07 | House | 1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1) |
2023-03-07 | House | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) |
2023-02-28 | House | Now in Judiciary Committee |
2023-02-28 | House | Referred to Judiciary Committee |
2023-02-28 | House | Original reference removed: Justice Appropriations Subcommittee |
2023-02-24 | House | CS Filed |
2023-02-24 | House | Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a) |
2023-02-24 | House | Reported out of Criminal Justice Subcommittee |
2023-02-23 | House | Favorable with CS by Criminal Justice Subcommittee |
2023-02-16 | House | Added to Criminal Justice Subcommittee agenda |
2023-02-01 | House | Now in Criminal Justice Subcommittee |
2023-02-01 | House | Referred to Judiciary Committee |
2023-02-01 | House | Referred to Justice Appropriations Subcommittee |
2023-02-01 | House | Referred to Criminal Justice Subcommittee |
2023-01-20 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S764 (Similar To) 2023-04-11 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 319 (Ch. 2023-195)