FL H0319 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Creates Florida Healthy Marriage Handbook; provides requirements for handbook; provides for distribution of printed copies of the handbook under certain circumstances; requires clerks of court to post electronic copies of handbook on its website & make handbook available to certain applicants; encourages clerks of court to provide list of course providers & websites where certain classes are available; prohibits issuance of marriage license until petitioners verify that both parties have obtained & read Florida Healthy Marriage Handbook or some other presentation of similar information.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Florida Healthy Marriage Handbook

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-14HouseDied in Judiciary Committee
2020-03-14HouseIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2020-02-12HouseNow in Judiciary Committee
2020-02-12HouseFavorable by Health and Human Services Committee; YEAS 17 NAYS 0
2020-02-10HouseOn Committee agenda-- Health and Human Services Committee, 02/12/20, 10:00 am, Morris Hall
2020-02-07HouseNow in Health and Human Services Committee
2020-02-07HouseCS referred to Health and Human Services Committee; Judiciary Committee
2020-02-07HouseOriginal reference(s) removed: Children, Families and Seniors Subcommittee
2020-02-06HouseCS by Civil Justice Subcommittee read 1st time
2020-02-06HousePending review of CS under Rule 7.18(c)
2020-02-04HouseCS by Civil Justice Subcommittee; YEAS 13 NAYS 0
2020-01-31HouseOn Committee agenda-- Civil Justice Subcommittee, 02/04/20, 3:30 pm, Sumner Hall
2020-01-14HouseIntroduced
2019-10-16HouseReferred to Civil Justice Subcommittee; Children, Families and Seniors Subcommittee; Judiciary Committee
2019-10-09HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S682 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Rules

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
7410307Amended CodeSee Bill Text
74104Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback