FL H0319 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (? 2-1)
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Health Policy, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 843 (Ch. 2019-138)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Requires hospitals to provide specified information & data relating to patient safety & quality measures to patient under certain circumstances or to any person upon request; requires hospitals & ambulatory surgical centers to submit patient safety culture survey data to AHCA; requires AHCA to develop such surveys; provides appropriations.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Patient Safety and Quality Measures

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-27 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#25 (Y: 101 N: 10 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-03SenateDied in Health Policy, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 843 (Ch. 2019-138)
2019-05-03SenateIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2019-04-04SenateReceived
2019-04-04SenateReferred to Health Policy; Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services; Appropriations
2019-04-03SenateIn Messages
2019-03-27HouseCS passed; YEAS 101 NAYS 10
2019-03-27HouseRead 3rd time
2019-03-27HousePlaced on 3rd reading
2019-03-27HouseRead 2nd time
2019-03-21HousePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 03/27/19
2019-03-18HousePlaced on Calendar
2019-03-15HouseCS/CS by Health and Human Services Committee read 1st time
2019-03-15HousePending review of CS -under Rule 7.18(c)
2019-03-14HouseCS/CS by- Health and Human Services Committee; YEAS 16 NAYS 0
2019-03-12HouseOn Committee agenda-- Health and Human Services Committee, 03/14/19, 12:00 pm, Morris Hall
2019-03-07HouseNow in Health and Human Services Committee
2019-03-07HouseFavorable by Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee; YEAS 7 NAYS 0
2019-03-05HouseCS by Health Market Reform Subcommittee read 1st time
2019-03-05HouseIntroduced
2019-03-04HouseOn Committee agenda-- Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee, 03/06/19, 3:00 pm, Sumner Hall
2019-02-15HouseNow in Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee
2019-02-13HousePending review of CS under Rule 7.18(c)
2019-02-13HouseCS by Health Market Reform Subcommittee; YEAS 11 NAYS 2
2019-02-06HouseOn Committee agenda-- Health Market Reform Subcommittee, 02/13/19, 10:30 am, Mashburn Hall
2019-01-23HouseReferred to Health Market Reform Subcommittee; Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee; Health and Human Services Committee
2019-01-17HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S1194 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Health Policy
S7078 (Similar To) 2019-04-26 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 843 (Ch. 2019-138), CS/HB 7 (Ch. 2019-105)
H843 (Similar To) 2019-06-26 - Chapter No. 2019-138, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 7 (Ch. 2019-105)

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
3951012Amended CodeSee Bill Text
400991Amended CodeSee Bill Text
40805Amended CodeSee Bill Text
408061Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4088065Amended CodeSee Bill Text
408810Amended CodeSee Bill Text
408820Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback