FL H0319 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (? 3-1)
Status: Passed on May 30 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-30 - Chapter No. 2013-78
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (? 3-1)
Status: Passed on May 30 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-30 - Chapter No. 2013-78
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revises provisions for local governments implementing transportation concurrency plans and provides requirements for certain alternatives.
Title
Community Transportation Projects
Sponsors
House Economic Affairs Committee | House Transportation and Highway Safety Subcommittee | House Economic Development and Tourism Subcommittee | Rep. Lake Ray [R] |
Roll Calls
2013-04-25 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#8 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-04-24 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#250 (Y: 108 N: 5 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-24 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#250 (Y: 108 N: 5 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-30 | Chapter No. 2013-78 | |
2013-05-30 | Approved by Governor | |
2013-05-20 | Signed by Officers and presented to Governor | |
2013-04-26 | House | Ordered enrolled |
2013-04-25 | Senate | CS passed; YEAS 36 NAYS 0 |
2013-04-25 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2013-04-25 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2013-04-25 | Senate | Substituted for CS/CS/SB 972 |
2013-04-25 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2013-04-25 | Senate | Withdrawn from Community Affairs; Transportation; Rules |
2013-04-25 | Senate | Received |
2013-04-24 | Senate | Referred to Community Affairs; Transportation; Rules |
2013-04-24 | Senate | In Messages |
2013-04-24 | House | CS passed; YEAS 108 NAYS 5 |
2013-04-24 | House | Read 3rd time |
2013-04-23 | House | Placed on 3rd reading |
2013-04-23 | House | Read 2nd time |
2013-04-19 | House | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/23/13 |
2013-04-01 | House | CS/CS/CS by Economic Affairs Committee read 1st time |
2013-04-01 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2013-03-29 | House | Pending review of CS -under Rule 7.19(c) |
2013-03-28 | House | CS/CS/CS by- Economic Affairs Committee; YEAS 16 NAYS 0 |
2013-03-26 | House | On Committee agenda-- Economic Affairs Committee, 03/28/13, 10:30 am, Reed Hall |
2013-03-25 | House | Now in Economic Affairs Committee |
2013-03-22 | House | CS/CS by Transportation and Highway Safety Subcommittee read 1st time |
2013-03-22 | House | Pending review of CS under Rule 7.19(c) |
2013-03-20 | House | CS/CS by Transportation and Highway Safety Subcommittee; YEAS 12 NAYS 1 |
2013-03-18 | House | CS by Economic Development and Tourism Subcommittee read 1st time |
2013-03-18 | House | On Committee agenda-- Transportation and Highway Safety Subcommittee, 03/20/13, 1:00 pm, 404 HOB |
2013-03-18 | House | Now in Transportation and Highway Safety Subcommittee |
2013-03-15 | House | Pending review of CS under Rule 7.19(c) |
2013-03-13 | House | CS by Economic Development and Tourism Subcommittee; YEAS 12 NAYS 0 |
2013-03-11 | House | On Committee agenda-- Economic Development and Tourism Subcommittee, 03/13/13, 9:00 am, 12 HOB |
2013-03-05 | House | Introduced |
2013-01-30 | House | Referred to Economic Development and Tourism Subcommittee; Transportation and Highway Safety Subcommittee; Economic Affairs Committee |
2013-01-18 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S0972 (Similar To) 2013-04-25 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/HB 319 (Ch. 2013-78)
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
163 | 3164 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
163 | 3180 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
163 | 3182 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
190 | 006 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |