FL H0319 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum:
Status: Failed on March 9 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-09 - Died in Regulated Industries, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 517 (Ch.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum:
Status: Failed on March 9 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-09 - Died in Regulated Industries, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 517 (Ch.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Exempts certain elevators from specific code update requirements; revises provisions relating to terms of condominium board of administration members; revises condominium unit owner election & condominium association meeting notice & recordkeeping requirements; provides requirements for condominiums relating to election challenges, recalls, & installation of impact glass or other code-compliant windows; revises liability of certain condominium unit owners, homeowners' association members, & cooperative unit owners acquiring title; provides requirements for condominiums created within condominium parcels; revises language with respect to assessments & liens; revises liability of unit owners; provides liability limitations of certain first mortgagee or its successor or assignees; revises provisions relating to imposing remedies against noncompliant or delinquent owners or members; revises records not accessible to members or parcel owners; revises provisions relating to amendment of declarations; provides criteria for consent to amendment; requires notice to mortgagees regarding proposed amendments.
Title
Residential Properties
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-02-29 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#975 (Y: 114 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-09 | Died in Regulated Industries, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 517 (Ch. | |
2012-03-05 | Referred to Regulated Industries; Judiciary; Budget Subcommittee on General Government Appropriations; Budget -SJ 840 | |
2012-03-05 | Received -SJ 840 | |
2012-02-29 | In Messages | |
2012-02-29 | CS passed as amended; YEAS 114 NAYS 1 -HJ 944 | |
2012-02-29 | Read 3rd time -HJ 943 | |
2012-02-28 | Placed on 3rd reading | |
2012-02-28 | Read 2nd time -HJ 893 | |
2012-02-24 | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 02/28/12 | |
2012-02-23 | CS/CS/CS by Judiciary Committee read 1st time -HJ 796 | |
2012-02-23 | Pending review of CS -under Rule 7.19(c) | |
2012-02-22 | CS/CS/CS by- Judiciary Committee; YEAS 13 NAYS 2 -HJ 814 | |
2012-02-20 | On Committee agenda-- Judiciary Committee, 02/22/12, 8:00 am, 404 HOB | |
2012-02-06 | Now in Judiciary Committee -HJ 525 | |
2012-02-03 | CS/CS by Business and Consumer Affairs Subcommittee read 1st time -HJ 462 | |
2012-02-03 | Pending review of CS under Rule 7.19(c) | |
2012-01-31 | CS/CS by Business and Consumer Affairs Subcommittee; YEAS 12 NAYS 1 -HJ 466 | |
2012-01-27 | On Committee agenda-- Business and Consumer Affairs Subcommittee, 01/31/12, 3:30 pm, 12 HOB | |
2012-01-10 | CS by Civil Justice Subcommittee read 1st time -HJ 164 | |
2012-01-10 | Introduced -HJ 33 | |
2012-01-04 | Now in Business and Consumer Affairs Subcommittee -HJ 169 | |
2011-12-16 | Pending review of CS under Rule 7.19(c) | |
2011-12-07 | CS by Civil Justice Subcommittee; YEAS 11 NAYS 3 -HJ 178 | |
2011-11-30 | On Committee agenda-- Civil Justice Subcommittee, 12/07/11, 1:00 pm, 404 HOB | |
2011-10-28 | Referred to Civil Justice Subcommittee; Business and Consumer Affairs Subcommittee; Judiciary Committee -HJ 33 | |
2011-10-11 | Filed |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
399 | 02 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
468 | 433 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
718 | 112 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
718 | 113 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
718 | 115 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
718 | 116 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
718 | 303 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
718 | 403 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
718 | 5011 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
718 | 707 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
719 | 104 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
719 | 1055 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
719 | 106 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
719 | 108 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
719 | 303 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
720 | 303 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
720 | 305 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
720 | 306 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
720 | 307 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
720 | 3085 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
721 | 16 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |