FL H0317 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Community Affairs
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Community Affairs
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Provides that a referendum to adopt or amend a local discretionary sales surtax must be held at a general election.
Title
Local Tax Referenda
Sponsors
House Government Accountability Committee | House Local, Federal and Veterans Affairs Subcommittee | Sen. Blaise Ingoglia [R] | Sen. Bryan Avila [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-01-31 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#562 (Y: 84 N: 27 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-10 | Senate | Died in Community Affairs |
2018-03-10 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Received |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Referred to Community Affairs; Appropriations Subcommittee on Finance and Tax; Appropriations; Rules |
2018-02-07 | Senate | In Messages |
2018-01-31 | House | CS passed; YEAS 84 NAYS 27 |
2018-01-31 | House | Read 3rd time |
2018-01-31 | House | Read 2nd time |
2018-01-25 | House | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 01/31/18 |
2018-01-23 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2018-01-22 | House | CS/CS by Government Accountability Committee read 1st time |
2018-01-19 | House | Pending review of CS -under Rule 7.18(c) |
2018-01-18 | House | CS/CS by- Government Accountability Committee; YEAS 17 NAYS 3 |
2018-01-16 | House | On Committee agenda-- Government Accountability Committee, 01/18/18, 10:30 am, Morris Hall |
2018-01-09 | House | CS by Local, Federal and Veterans Affairs Subcommittee read 1st time |
2018-01-09 | House | Introduced |
2017-12-05 | House | Now in Government Accountability Committee |
2017-12-05 | House | Favorable by Ways and Means Committee; YEAS 18 NAYS 0 |
2017-11-28 | House | On Committee agenda-- Ways and Means Committee, 12/05/17, 4:00 pm, Morris Hall |
2017-11-13 | House | Now in Ways and Means Committee |
2017-11-09 | House | Pending review of CS under Rule 7.18(c) |
2017-11-08 | House | CS by Local, Federal and Veterans Affairs Subcommittee; YEAS 12 NAYS 2 |
2017-11-01 | House | On Committee agenda-- Local, Federal and Veterans Affairs Subcommittee, 11/08/17, 8:00 am, 12 HOB |
2017-10-18 | House | Referred to Local, Federal and Veterans Affairs Subcommittee; Ways and Means Committee; Government Accountability Committee |
2017-10-12 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S272 (Same As) 2018-03-10 - Died in Rules
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
166 | 211 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
212 | 055 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |