FL H0317 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 2 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-02 - Died in Transportation and Highway Safety Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 2 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-02 - Died in Transportation and Highway Safety Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Designates act as "Driver Accountability Act"; provides criminal penalty payment alternative if court finds that violator has demonstrable financial hardship; revises provisions relating to driving while license is suspended, revoked, canceled, or disqualified.
Title
Driver Licenses & Driving Privileges
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-02 | House | Died in Transportation and Highway Safety Subcommittee |
2014-03-04 | House | Introduced |
2013-12-13 | House | Referred to Transportation and Highway Safety Subcommittee; Appropriations Committee; Economic Affairs Committee |
2013-11-15 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S0302 (Same As) 2014-05-02 - Died in Transportation
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
318 | 18 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
322 | 245 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
322 | 34 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
921 | 0022 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
932 | 701 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2014/317 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2014/0317/BillText/Filed/PDF |