FL H0317 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum:
Status: Vetoed on April 29 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-29 - Laid on Table
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on April 29 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-29 - Laid on Table
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes forensic & civil facilities to order continuation of psychotherapeutics for individuals receiving such medications in jail before admission; provides timeframes within which competency hearings must be held; revises time for dismissal of certain charges for defendants that remain incompetent to proceed to trial; provides exceptions; standardizes protocols, procedures, diagnostic criteria, & information & findings that must be included in expert's competency evaluation report.
Title
Mental Health Treatment
Sponsors
Sen. Daphne Campbell [D] | Rep. George Moraitis [R] | House Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee | House Healthy Families Subcommittee |
Rep. Elaine Schwartz [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-29 | House | Laid on Table |
2013-04-29 | House | Substituted CS/SB 1420 (Vetoed by Governor) |
2013-04-26 | House | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/29/13 |
2013-04-16 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2013-04-16 | House | Favorable by- Health and Human Services Committee; YEAS 13 NAYS 0 |
2013-04-12 | House | On Committee agenda-- Health and Human Services Committee, 04/16/13, 9:00 am, Morris Hall |
2013-04-12 | House | Now in Health and Human Services Committee |
2013-04-11 | House | CS/CS by Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee read 1st time |
2013-04-11 | House | Pending review of CS under Rule 7.19(c) |
2013-04-10 | House | CS/CS by Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee; YEAS 12 NAYS 0 |
2013-04-08 | House | On Committee agenda-- Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee, 04/10/13, 8:30 am, Webster Hall |
2013-03-27 | House | Now in Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee |
2013-03-27 | House | Favorable by Criminal Justice Subcommittee; YEAS 11 NAYS 0 |
2013-03-25 | House | On Committee agenda-- Criminal Justice Subcommittee, 03/27/13, 8:00 am, 404 HOB |
2013-03-05 | House | CS by Healthy Families Subcommittee read 1st time |
2013-03-05 | House | Introduced |
2013-02-21 | House | Now in Criminal Justice Subcommittee |
2013-02-19 | House | Pending review of CS under Rule 7.19(c) |
2013-02-13 | House | CS by Healthy Families Subcommittee; YEAS 10 NAYS 0 |
2013-02-06 | House | On Committee agenda-- Healthy Families Subcommittee, 02/13/13, 2:00 pm, 12 HOB |
2013-01-30 | House | Referred to Healthy Families Subcommittee; Criminal Justice Subcommittee; Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee; Health and Human Services Committee |
2013-01-18 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1420 (Same As) 2013-06-12 - Vetoed by Governor
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
916 | 107 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
916 | 111 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
916 | 115 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
916 | 13 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
916 | 145 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
916 | 15 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
985 | 19 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |