FL H0317 | 2010 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on May 11 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-11 - Approved by Governor; Chapter No. 2010-51
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Revises provisions relating to sending of or procuring sending of letters or inscribed communications containing certain threats of death or bodily injury; includes electronic communications in provisions.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Threats [SPSC]

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2010-04-22 - Senate - Senate Roll Call No. 0055 - Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-22 - House - House Roll Call No. 0891 - Passage (Y: 111 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2010-05-11 Approved by Governor; Chapter No. 2010-51
2010-04-30 Signed by Officers and presented to Governor -HJ 01700
2010-04-23 Ordered enrolled -HJ 01032
2010-04-22 In Messages; Received -SJ 00753; Referred to Criminal Justice -SJ 00753; Withdrawn from Criminal Justice -SJ 00742; Substituted for CS/SB 860 -SJ 00742; Read 2nd time -SJ 00742; Read 3rd time -SJ 00742; CS passed; YEAS 38 NAYS 0 -SJ 00742
2010-04-22 Read 3rd time -HJ 00870; CS passed; YEAS 111 NAYS 0 -HJ 00870
2010-04-21 Placed on Special Order Calendar; Read 2nd time -HJ 00840
2010-04-13 Favorable by- Criminal & Civil Justice Policy Council; YEAS 12 NAYS 0 -HJ 00676; Placed on Calendar -HJ 00676
2010-04-09 On Council agenda-- Criminal & Civil Justice Policy Council, 04/13/10, 9:15 am, 404-H
2010-03-10 Favorable by Criminal & Civil Justice Appropriations (CGHC); YEAS 14 NAYS 0 -HJ 00268; Now in Criminal & Civil Justice Policy Council -HJ 00268
2010-03-08 On Committee agenda-- Criminal & Civil Justice Appropriations (CGHC), 03/10/10, 3:00 pm, Reed Hall
2010-03-02 Introduced, referred to Public Safety & Domestic Security Policy (CCJP); Criminal & Civil Justice Appropriations (CGHC); Criminal & Civil Justice Policy Council -HJ 00033; On Committee agenda-- Public Safety & Domestic Security Policy (CCJP), 02/16/10, 10:15 am, 404-H; CS by Public Safety & Domestic Security Policy (CCJP); YEAS 12 NAYS 0 -HJ 00169; CS read 1st time on 03/02/10 -HJ 00158; Pending review of CS under Rule 7.20; Now in Criminal & Civil Justice Appropriations (CGHC) -HJ 00163
2010-02-26 Now in Criminal & Civil Justice Appropriations (CGHC)
2010-02-17 Pending review of CS under Rule 7.20
2010-02-16 CS by Public Safety & Domestic Security Policy (CCJP); YEAS 12 NAYS 0
2010-02-09 On Committee agenda-- Public Safety & Domestic Security Policy (CCJP), 02/16/10, 10:15 am, 404-H
2009-11-20 Referred to Public Safety & Domestic Security Policy (CCJP); Criminal & Civil Justice Appropriations (CGHC); Criminal & Civil Justice Policy Council
2009-11-05 Filed

Same As/Similar To

S0860 (Similar To) 2010-04-22 - Read 3rd time -SJ 00742; Substituted CS/HB 317 -SJ 00742; Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 317 (Ch. 2010-51) -SJ 00742

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
083610Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback