FL H0315 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on October 12 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-14 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/CS/SB 568
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on October 12 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-14 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/CS/SB 568
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Revises definition of term "telephonic sales call" to include voicemail transmissions; defines "voicemail transmissions"; prohibits voicemail transmissions to specified persons; provides requirements for certain telephone numbers used by solicitors.
Title
Telephone Solicitation
Sponsors
House Commerce Committee | House Careers and Competition Subcommittee | Sen. Loranne Ausley [D] | Rep. Kamia Brown [D] |
Rep. Kimberly Daniels [D] | Rep. Brad Drake [R] | Rep. Barrington Russell [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-14 | House | Laid on Table, refer to CS/CS/SB 568 |
2018-02-14 | House | Substituted CS/CS/SB 568 |
2018-02-08 | House | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 02/14/18 |
2018-02-05 | House | CS/CS by Commerce Committee read 1st time |
2018-02-05 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2018-02-02 | House | Pending review of CS -under Rule 7.18(c) |
2018-02-01 | House | CS/CS by- Commerce Committee; YEAS 24 NAYS 0 |
2018-01-30 | House | On Committee agenda-- Commerce Committee, 02/01/18, 12:00 pm, Webster Hall |
2018-01-18 | House | Now in Commerce Committee |
2018-01-17 | House | CS by Careers and Competition Subcommittee read 1st time |
2018-01-17 | House | Pending review of CS under Rule 7.18(c) |
2018-01-09 | House | CS by Careers and Competition Subcommittee; YEAS 14 NAYS 0 |
2018-01-09 | House | Introduced |
2018-01-05 | House | On Committee agenda-- Careers and Competition Subcommittee, 01/09/18, 1:00 pm, Webster Hall |
2017-10-18 | House | Referred to Careers and Competition Subcommittee; Commerce Committee |
2017-10-12 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S568 (Same As) 2018-03-21 - Chapter No. 2018-23
S740 (Similar To) 2018-03-26 - Chapter No. 2018-84
H553 (Similar To) 2018-03-06 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/CS/SB 740
S740 (Similar To) 2018-03-26 - Chapter No. 2018-84
H553 (Similar To) 2018-03-06 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/CS/SB 740