FL H0311 | 2024 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on November 1 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-04 - Laid on Table
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Revises list of securities & transactions that are exempt from registration requirements; authorizes issuer to engage in general advertising & solicitation; removes requirements for escrow agreement; revises amount that may be received for sales of certain securities; provides certain sales are voidable within specified timeframe; specifies limitation on amount of cash & other consideration that may be received from sales of securities; prohibits issuer from accepting more than specified amount from single purchaser; prohibits issuer from withdrawing any amount of offering proceeds until target offering amount has been received; provides that certain communications are not deemed to constitute general solicitation or general advertising.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Securities

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2024-01-30 - House - House Commerce Committee (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-18 - House - House Insurance & Banking Subcommittee (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2024-03-04HouseLaid on Table
2024-02-29HouseAdded to Second Reading Calendar
2024-02-29HouseTemporarily postponed, on 2nd Reading
2024-02-26HouseBill added to Special Order Calendar (2/29/2024)
2024-02-02HouseAdded to Second Reading Calendar
2024-02-02HouseBill referred to House Calendar
2024-02-01House1st Reading (Committee Substitute 2)
2024-02-01HouseCS Filed
2024-02-01HouseLaid on Table under Rule 7.18(a)
2024-01-31HouseReported out of Commerce Committee
2024-01-30HouseFavorable with CS by Commerce Committee
2024-01-26HouseAdded to Commerce Committee agenda
2024-01-22House1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1)
2024-01-22HouseNow in Commerce Committee
2024-01-22HouseReferred to Commerce Committee
2024-01-22HouseOriginal reference removed: State Administration & Technology Appropriations Subcommittee
2024-01-19HouseCS Filed
2024-01-19HouseLaid on Table under Rule 7.18(a)
2024-01-19HouseReported out of Insurance & Banking Subcommittee
2024-01-18HouseFavorable with CS by Insurance & Banking Subcommittee
2024-01-16HousePCS added to Insurance & Banking Subcommittee agenda
2024-01-09House1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
2024-01-09HouseAdded to Insurance & Banking Subcommittee agenda
2023-11-13HouseNow in Insurance & Banking Subcommittee
2023-11-13HouseReferred to Commerce Committee
2023-11-13HouseReferred to State Administration & Technology Appropriations Subcommittee
2023-11-13HouseReferred to Insurance & Banking Subcommittee
2023-11-01HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S532 (Similar To) 2024-05-13 - Chapter No. 2024-168

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
517021Amended CodeSee Bill Text
517051Amended CodeSee Bill Text
517061Amended CodeSee Bill Text
5170611Amended CodeSee Bill Text
5170612Amended CodeSee Bill Text
5170613Amended CodeSee Bill Text
5170614Amended CodeSee Bill Text
5170615Amended CodeSee Bill Text
5170616Amended CodeSee Bill Text
517072Amended CodeSee Bill Text
517081Amended CodeSee Bill Text
517101Amended CodeSee Bill Text
51712Amended CodeSee Bill Text
5171201Amended CodeSee Bill Text
5171202Amended CodeSee Bill Text
517131Amended CodeSee Bill Text
517141Amended CodeSee Bill Text
517191Amended CodeSee Bill Text
517211Amended CodeSee Bill Text
517221Amended CodeSee Bill Text
517241Amended CodeSee Bill Text
517301Amended CodeSee Bill Text
517302Amended CodeSee Bill Text
517311Amended CodeSee Bill Text
517312Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2024/311
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2024/311/BillText/Filed/PDF
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2024/311/BillText/c1/PDF
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2024/311/BillText/c2/PDF
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2024/311/Amendment/165013/PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2024/311/Analyses/h0311.IBS.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2024/311/Analyses/h0311a.IBS.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2024/311/Analyses/h0311b.COM.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2024/311/Analyses/h0311c.COM.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2024/311/Analyses/h0311z.IBS.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2024/311/Analyses/h0311z1.IBS.PDF
Roll Callhttps://www.myfloridahouse.gov/Sections/Committees/billvote.aspx?VoteId=70084&IsPCB=1&BillId=78880
Roll Callhttps://www.myfloridahouse.gov/Sections/Committees/billvote.aspx?VoteId=70809&IsPCB=0&BillId=78880

Bill Comments

feedback