FL H0311 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Failed on April 28 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-28 - Died in Finance and Tax Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Failed on April 28 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-28 - Died in Finance and Tax Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Extends expiration date applicable to granting of community contribution tax credit against sales & use tax, corporate income tax, & insurance premium tax for contributions to eligible sponsors of revitalization & housing projects approved by DEO; reenacts provisions to incorporate changes made by act.
Title
Community Contribution Tax Credit Program
Sponsors
Sen. Blaise Ingoglia [R] | Rep. Robert Cortes [R] | Rep. Chris Latvala [R] | Sen. Keith Perry [R] |
Rep. Jake Raburn [R] | Rep. Jennifer Sullivan [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-28 | House | Died in Finance and Tax Committee |
2015-03-04 | House | Now in Finance and Tax Committee |
2015-03-03 | House | Favorable by Economic Development and Tourism Subcommittee; YEAS 10 NAYS 0 |
2015-03-03 | House | Introduced |
2015-02-27 | House | On Committee agenda-- Economic Development and Tourism Subcommittee, 03/03/15, 4:30 pm, 12 HOB |
2015-01-28 | House | Referred to Economic Development and Tourism Subcommittee; Finance and Tax Committee; Economic Affairs Committee |
2015-01-16 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S0302 (Same As) 2015-05-01 - Died in Appropriations
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
212 | 08 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
220 | 02 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
220 | 183 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
377 | 809 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
624 | 5105 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/311 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/0311/BillText/Filed/PDF |