FL H0307 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Governmental Oversight and Accountability
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Provides quorum requirements for Commission on Human Relations & its panels; revises number of persons commission may recommend for Florida Civil Rights Hall of Fame; requires commission to provide notice to aggrieved person in certain circumstances; provides limitation on time civil action may be filed after alleged violation of Florida Civil Rights Act; revises length of time commission or AG has to resolve complaint of discrimination in club membership; revises timeline relating to complaints alleging prohibited personnel action.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Florida Commission on Human Relations

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-01 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#740 (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-10SenateDied in Governmental Oversight and Accountability
2018-03-10SenateIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2018-03-02SenateReceived
2018-03-01SenateReferred to Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Judiciary; Rules
2018-03-01SenateIn Messages
2018-03-01HouseCS passed; YEAS 113 NAYS 0
2018-03-01HouseRead 3rd time
2018-02-28HousePlaced on 3rd reading
2018-02-28HouseRead 2nd time
2018-02-22HousePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 02/28/18
2018-02-21HousePlaced on Calendar
2018-02-21HouseFavorable by- Judiciary Committee; YEAS 17 NAYS 0
2018-02-19HouseOn Committee agenda-- Judiciary Committee, 02/21/18, 9:00 am, Sumner Hall
2018-01-09HouseCS by Civil Justice and Claims Subcommittee read 1st time
2018-01-09HouseIntroduced
2017-12-06HouseNow in Judiciary Committee
2017-12-06HouseFavorable by Oversight, Transparency and Administration Subcommittee; YEAS 11 NAYS 0
2017-11-29HouseOn Committee agenda-- Oversight, Transparency and Administration Subcommittee, 12/06/17, 4:00 pm, Morris Hall
2017-11-13HouseNow in Oversight, Transparency and Administration Subcommittee
2017-11-09HousePending review of CS under Rule 7.18(c)
2017-11-08HouseCS by Civil Justice and Claims Subcommittee; YEAS 14 NAYS 0
2017-11-01HouseOn Committee agenda-- Civil Justice and Claims Subcommittee, 11/08/17, 1:30 pm, Sumner Hall
2017-10-18HouseReferred to Civil Justice and Claims Subcommittee; Oversight, Transparency and Administration Subcommittee; Judiciary Committee
2017-10-12HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S300 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Rules

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
11231895Amended CodeSee Bill Text
76003Amended CodeSee Bill Text
760065Amended CodeSee Bill Text
76011Amended CodeSee Bill Text
76029Amended CodeSee Bill Text
76031Amended CodeSee Bill Text
76060Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback