FL H0305 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-03 - Died in Health Quality Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-03 - Died in Health Quality Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes certified registered nurse anesthetists to practice within protocol established in collaboration with, rather than with approval of, physicians & medical staff of facility in which anesthetic service is performed.
Title
Certified Registered Nurse Anesthetists
Sponsors
Rep. Erik Fresen [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-03 | House | Died in Health Quality Subcommittee |
2013-03-05 | House | Introduced |
2013-01-30 | House | Referred to Health Quality Subcommittee; Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee; Health and Human Services Committee |
2013-01-18 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H0207 (Same As) 2013-01-18 - Withdrawn prior to introduction
S1450 (Same As) 2013-05-03 - Died in Health Policy
S1450 (Same As) 2013-05-03 - Died in Health Policy
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2013/305 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2013/0305/BillText/Filed/PDF |