FL H0303 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 13-6)
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Creates Alternative Treatment Options for Veterans Pilot Program within DVA; requires DVA to contract with individuals & entities to provide alternative treatment to certain veterans; defines "alternative treatment"; requires supervision of certain licensed individuals; requires reports to DVA, Governor, & Legislature; provides for expiration.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Alternative Treatment Options for Veterans Pilot Program

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-10HouseDied in Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee
2018-03-10HouseIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2018-01-24HouseNow in Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee
2018-01-23HouseFavorable by Health Innovation Subcommittee; YEAS 13 NAYS 0
2018-01-19HouseOn Committee agenda-- Health Innovation Subcommittee, 01/23/18, 1:30 pm, Mashburn Hall
2018-01-09HouseIntroduced
2017-10-18HouseReferred to Health Innovation Subcommittee; Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee; Health and Human Services Committee
2017-10-11HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S82 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Banking and Insurance
H1191 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Local, Federal and Veterans Affairs Subcommittee
S1566 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Military and Veterans Affairs, Space, and Domestic Security

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
295156Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback