FL H0299 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-14 - Died in Regulatory Reform Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-14 - Died in Regulatory Reform Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides requirements for social media platforms relating to acceptable use policies, quarterly transparency reports, & complaint system; authorizes AG to bring action against social media platforms & to recover certain costs.
Title
Social Media Platforms
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-14 | House | Died in Regulatory Reform Subcommittee |
2022-03-12 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2022-01-11 | House | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) |
2021-10-26 | House | Now in Regulatory Reform Subcommittee |
2021-10-26 | House | Referred to Commerce Committee |
2021-10-26 | House | Referred to Civil Justice & Property Rights Subcommittee |
2021-10-26 | House | Referred to Regulatory Reform Subcommittee |
2021-10-14 | House | Filed |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
501 | 2041 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
501 | 2042 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2022/299 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2022/299/BillText/Filed/PDF |