FL H0295 | 2014 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on November 7 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-02 - Died on Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Revises provisions relating to reemployment of retirees as instructional personnel on contract basis; provides legislative intent & findings to clarify authorization to award contracts; provides requirements for judgment in certain civil actions or administrative proceedings.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Employment after Retirement of School District Personnel

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2014-05-02HouseDied on Calendar
2014-04-01HousePlaced on Calendar
2014-04-01HouseFavorable by- Appropriations Committee; YEAS 23 NAYS 0
2014-03-28HouseOn Committee agenda-- Appropriations Committee, 04/01/14, 2:30 pm, Webster Hall
2014-03-21HouseNow in Appropriations Committee
2014-03-21HouseCS referred to Appropriations Committee
2014-03-21HouseOriginal reference(s) removed: Education Committee
2014-03-19HouseCS by Government Operations Subcommittee read 1st time
2014-03-19HousePending review of CS under Rule 7.19(c)
2014-03-18HouseCS by Government Operations Subcommittee; YEAS 10 NAYS 0
2014-03-14HouseOn Committee agenda-- Government Operations Subcommittee, 03/18/14, 9:00 am, Webster Hall
2014-03-04HouseIntroduced
2013-12-13HouseReferred to Government Operations Subcommittee; Appropriations Committee; Education Committee
2013-11-07HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S0560 (Similar To) 2014-05-02 - Died in Education

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
101233Amended CodeSee Bill Text
121091Amended CodeSee Bill Text
238181Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback