FL H0295 | 2013 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-03 - Died in Education
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Designates month of September as "American Founders' Month"; authorizes Governor to annually issue proclamation designating month & urging participation; requires district school boards to celebrate American Founders & principles inherent in country's founding documents by observing American Founders' Month; provides that instruction may be integrated into existing school curriculum.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

American Founders' Month

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2013-04-04 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#60 (Y: 119 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-05-03SenateDied in Education
2013-04-15SenateReceived
2013-04-12SenateReferred to Education; Appropriations Subcommittee on Education; Appropriations
2013-04-11SenateIn Messages
2013-04-04HousePassed as amended; YEAS 119 NAYS 0
2013-04-04HouseRead 3rd time
2013-04-02HousePlaced on 3rd reading
2013-04-02HouseAmendment(s) adopted (204583, 797125)
2013-04-02HouseRead 2nd time
2013-03-29HousePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 04/02/13
2013-03-22HousePlaced on Calendar
2013-03-22HouseFavorable by- Education Committee; YEAS 16 NAYS 0
2013-03-20HouseOn Committee agenda-- Education Committee, 03/22/13, 8:00 am, Reed Hall
2013-03-19HouseNow in Education Committee
2013-03-19HouseFavorable by Education Appropriations Subcommittee; YEAS 13 NAYS 0
2013-03-15HouseOn Committee agenda-- Education Appropriations Subcommittee, 03/19/13, 8:00 am, Morris Hall
2013-03-13HouseNow in Education Appropriations Subcommittee
2013-03-13HouseFavorable by K-12 Subcommittee; YEAS 12 NAYS 0
2013-03-11HouseOn Committee agenda-- K-12 Subcommittee, 03/13/13, 1:00 pm, Morris Hall
2013-03-05HouseIntroduced
2013-01-30HouseReferred to K-12 Subcommittee; Education Appropriations Subcommittee; Education Committee
2013-01-18HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S0476 (Similar To) 2013-05-03 - Died in Education

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
100344Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback