FL H0295 | 2010 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-2)
Status: Passed on April 27 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-27 - Approved by Governor -HJ 01180; Chapter No. 2010-28
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Includes within DOH's environmental health program investigation of food service programs of domestic violence centers & group care homes; excludes domestic violence centers from definition of term "food service establishment" under certain conditions.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Food Service/Domestic Violence Centers/Group Care [SPSC]

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2010-04-08 - Senate - Senate Roll Call No. 0010 - Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-18 - House - House Roll Call No. 0575 - Passage (Y: 111 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2010-04-27 Approved by Governor -HJ 01180; Chapter No. 2010-28
2010-04-20 Signed by Officers and presented to Governor -HJ 00791
2010-04-15 Ordered enrolled -HJ 00714
2010-04-08 Withdrawn from Health Regulation; Children, Families, and Elder Affairs -SJ 00519; Substituted for CS/CS/SB 532 -SJ 00519; Read 2nd time -SJ 00519; Read 3rd time -SJ 00519; CS passed; YEAS 37 NAYS 0 -SJ 00519
2010-04-06 Received -SJ 00512; Referred to Health Regulation; Children, Families, and Elder Affairs -SJ 00512
2010-03-23 In Messages
2010-03-18 Read 3rd time -HJ 00315; CS passed as amended; YEAS 111 NAYS 0 -HJ 00316
2010-03-16 Placed on Special Order Calendar; Read 2nd time -HJ 00282; Amendment(s) adopted -HJ 00282
2010-03-02 Introduced, referred to Health Care Regulation Policy (HFPC); Health Care Appropriations (CGHC); Health & Family Services Policy Council -HJ 00031; On Committee agenda-- Health Care Regulation Policy (HFPC), 02/02/10, 9:00 am, Morris Hall; CS by Health Care Regulation Policy (HFPC); YEAS 14 NAYS 0 -HJ 00168; CS read 1st time on 03/02/10 -HJ 00157; Pending review of CS under Rule 7.20; Original reference(s) removed: Health Care Appropriations (CGHC); CS referred to Health & Family Services Policy Council -HJ 00163; Now in Health & Family Services Policy Council -HJ 00163; On Council agenda-- Health & Family Services Policy Council, 03/01/10, 2:15 pm, Webster Hall; Favorable by- Health & Family Services Policy Council; YEAS 13 NAYS 0 -HJ 00171; Placed on Calendar -HJ 00171
2010-03-01 Favorable by- Health & Family Services Policy Council; YEAS 13 NAYS 0
2010-02-22 On Council agenda-- Health & Family Services Policy Council, 03/01/10, 2:15 pm, Webster Hall
2010-02-09 Original reference(s) removed: Health Care Appropriations (CGHC); CS referred to Health & Family Services Policy Council; Now in Health & Family Services Policy Council
2010-02-05 Pending review of CS under Rule 7.20
2010-02-02 CS by Health Care Regulation Policy (HFPC); YEAS 14 NAYS 0
2010-01-26 On Committee agenda-- Health Care Regulation Policy (HFPC), 02/02/10, 9:00 am, Morris Hall
2009-11-13 Referred to Health Care Regulation Policy (HFPC); Health Care Appropriations (CGHC); Health & Family Services Policy Council
2009-11-03 Filed

Same As/Similar To

S0532 (Similar To) 2010-04-08 - Read 3rd time -SJ 00519; Substituted CS/HB 295 -SJ 00519; Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 295 (Ch. 2010-28) -SJ 00519

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
0381006Amended CodeSee Bill Text
03810072Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/index.cfm?Mode=Bills&SubMenu=1&Tab=session&BI_Mode=ViewBillInfo&BillNum=0295&Chamber=House&Year=2010
Texthttp://www.flsenate.gov/cgi-bin/view_page.pl?Tab=session&Submenu=1&FT=D&File=hb029500.html&Directory=session/2010/House/bills/billtext/html/
Texthttp://www.flsenate.gov/cgi-bin/view_page.pl?Tab=session&Submenu=1&FT=D&File=hb029501c1.html&Directory=session/2010/House/bills/billtext/html/
Texthttp://www.flsenate.gov/cgi-bin/view_page.pl?Tab=session&Submenu=1&FT=D&File=hb029502e1.html&Directory=session/2010/House/bills/billtext/html/
Roll Callhttp://www.flsenate.gov/cgi-bin/view_page.pl?Tab=session&Submenu=1&FT=D&File=session/2010/House/bills/votes/html/hHB02950318100575.html
Roll Callhttp://www.flsenate.gov/cgi-bin/view_page.pl?Tab=session&Submenu=1&FT=D&File=session/2010/House/bills/votes/html/SHB02950408100010.html

Bill Comments 750

feedback