FL H0293 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Establishes Kidcare Operational Efficiency & Health Care Improvement Workgroup as task force administratively housed in DOH to maximize return on investment & enhance operational efficiencies of program.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Florida Kidcare Program

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-10HouseDied in Health and Human Services Committee
2018-03-10HouseIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2018-01-16HouseNow in Health and Human Services Committee
2018-01-16HouseCS referred to Health and Human Services Committee
2018-01-16HouseOriginal reference(s) removed: Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee
2018-01-11HouseCS by Health Innovation Subcommittee read 1st time
2018-01-11HousePending review of CS under Rule 7.18(c)
2018-01-10HouseCS by Health Innovation Subcommittee; YEAS 14 NAYS 0
2018-01-09HouseIntroduced
2018-01-08HouseOn Committee agenda-- Health Innovation Subcommittee, 01/10/18, 12:30 pm, Mashburn Hall
2017-10-18HouseReferred to Health Innovation Subcommittee; Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee; Health and Human Services Committee
2017-10-11HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S108 (Same As) 2018-03-10 - Died in Rules

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
2003Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback