FL H0291 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Creates Prescription Drug Donation Repository Program within DOH; provides criteria & conditions for donation of prescription drugs & supplies from certain authorized entities for dispensing to eligible patients.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Prescription Drug Donation Repository Program

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-10HouseDied in Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee
2018-03-10HouseIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2018-02-05HouseNow in Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee
2018-02-05HouseCS referred to Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee; Health and Human Services Committee
2018-02-01HouseCS by Health Quality Subcommittee read 1st time
2018-02-01HousePending review of CS under Rule 7.18(c)
2018-01-29HouseCS by Health Quality Subcommittee; YEAS 13 NAYS 0
2018-01-25HouseOn Committee agenda-- Health Quality Subcommittee, 01/29/18, 3:00 pm, Mashburn Hall
2018-01-09HouseIntroduced
2017-10-18HouseReferred to Health Quality Subcommittee; Health and Human Services Committee
2017-10-10HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S710 (Same As) 2018-03-10 - Died in Messages

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
25236Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4651902Amended CodeSee Bill Text
499029Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback