FL H0289 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-4)
Status: Passed on June 7 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-07 - Chapter No. 2010-216
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-4)
Status: Passed on June 7 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-07 - Chapter No. 2010-216
Summary
Revises authorized uses of revenue received from sale of Sea Turtle license plate; creates Fraternal Order of Police license plate; establishes annual use fee for plate; provides for distribution of use fees received from sale of such plates.
Title
Specialty License Plates [CPSC]
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-07 | Chapter No. 2010-216 | |
2010-06-04 | Approved by Governor | |
2010-05-21 | Signed by Officers and presented to Governor | |
2010-04-30 | Ordered enrolled -HJ 01693 | |
2010-04-30 | Withdrawn from Transportation; Criminal Justice; Transportation and Economic Development Appropriations -SJ 01141; Substituted for SB 978 -SJ 01141; Read 2nd time -SJ 01141; Read 3rd time -SJ 01141; CS passed; YEAS 35 NAYS 3 -SJ 01141 | |
2010-04-29 | Received -SJ 01135; Referred to Transportation; Criminal Justice; Transportation and Economic Development Appropriations -SJ 01135 | |
2010-03-24 | In Messages | |
2010-03-23 | Read 3rd time -HJ 00364; Amendment(s) failed -HJ 00364; Amendment(s) adopted -HJ 00364; CS passed as amended; YEAS 111 NAYS 0 -HJ 00365 | |
2010-03-18 | Placed on Special Order Calendar; Read 2nd time -HJ 00330 | |
2010-03-03 | Favorable by- Economic Development & Community Affairs Policy Council; YEAS 14 NAYS 0 -HJ 00207; Placed on Calendar -HJ 00207 | |
2010-03-02 | Introduced, referred to Roads, Bridges, & Ports Policy (EDCA); Economic Development & Community Affairs Policy Council -HJ 00031; On Committee agenda-- Roads, Bridges, & Ports Policy (EDCA), 01/13/10, 9:00 am, 404-H; CS by Roads, Bridges, & Ports Policy (EDCA); YEAS 12 NAYS 1 -HJ 00166; CS read 1st time on 03/02/10 -HJ 00157; Pending review of CS under Rule 7.20; Now in Economic Development & Community Affairs Policy Council -HJ 00163; On Council agenda-- Economic Development & Community Affairs Policy Council, 03/03/10, 10:45 am, 404-H | |
2010-03-01 | On Council agenda-- Economic Development & Community Affairs Policy Council, 03/03/10, 10:45 am, 404-H | |
2010-01-27 | Now in Economic Development & Community Affairs Policy Council | |
2010-01-22 | Pending review of CS under Rule 7.20 | |
2010-01-13 | CS by Roads, Bridges, & Ports Policy (EDCA); YEAS 12 NAYS 1 | |
2010-01-06 | On Committee agenda-- Roads, Bridges, & Ports Policy (EDCA), 01/13/10, 9:00 am, 404-H | |
2009-11-13 | Referred to Roads, Bridges, & Ports Policy (EDCA); Economic Development & Community Affairs Policy Council | |
2009-10-30 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S0978 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Placed on Special Order Calendar; Read 2nd time -SJ 01141; Amendment(s) adopted (753998) -SJ 01141; Substituted CS/HB 289 -SJ 01141; Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 289 (Ch. 2010-216) -SJ 01141
H1043 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Messages, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 289 (Ch. 2010-216)
S1986 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Communications, Energy, and Public Utilities, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 289 (Ch. 2010-216)
H1043 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Messages, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 289 (Ch. 2010-216)
S1986 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Communications, Energy, and Public Utilities, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 289 (Ch. 2010-216)
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
0320 | 08056 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0320 | 08058 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/index.cfm?Mode=Bills&SubMenu=1&Tab=session&BI_Mode=ViewBillInfo&BillNum=0289&Chamber=House&Year=2010 |