FL H0283 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-14 - Died in Local Administration & Veterans Affairs Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-14 - Died in Local Administration & Veterans Affairs Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides exception from assessment of homestead property at just value upon transfer of property if property is transferred to child or grandchild of deceased owner; specifies procedures for effectuating such transfer.
Title
Homestead Assessments Following a Change in Ownership
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-14 | House | Died in Local Administration & Veterans Affairs Subcommittee |
2022-03-12 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2022-01-11 | House | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) |
2021-10-22 | House | Now in Local Administration & Veterans Affairs Subcommittee |
2021-10-22 | House | Referred to State Affairs Committee |
2021-10-22 | House | Referred to Ways & Means Committee |
2021-10-22 | House | Referred to Local Administration & Veterans Affairs Subcommittee |
2021-10-13 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S460 (Same As) 2022-03-14 - Died in Community Affairs
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2022/283 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2022/283/BillText/Filed/PDF |