FL H0283 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Civil Justice & Courts Policy (CCJP)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Civil Justice & Courts Policy (CCJP)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides for relief of Dennis Gay; provides appropriation to compensate him for injuries sustained as result of negligence of DOT; provides for use of funds; provides for reversion of funds to state; provides limitation on total amount paid for fees & costs. CLAIM WITH APPROPRIATION: $700,000.
Title
Relief/Dennis Gay/DOT
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-30 | Died in Committee on Civil Justice & Courts Policy (CCJP) | |
2010-03-02 | Introduced, referred to Civil Justice & Courts Policy (CCJP); Transportation & Economic Development Appropriations (CEED) -HJ 00031 | |
2009-11-13 | Referred to Civil Justice & Courts Policy (CCJP); Transportation & Economic Development Appropriations (CEED) | |
2009-10-29 | Filed |