FL H0281 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 22 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-22 - Chapter No. 2018-45
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Requires DCF to include parents who are incarcerated in development of case plans for their children; specifies respective responsibilities of department, correctional facilities, & incarcerated parents; provides conditions for amending case plan.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Incarcerated Parents

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-06 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#4 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-31 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#558 (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-22 Chapter No. 2018-45
2018-03-21 Approved by Governor
2018-03-14 Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
2018-03-06HouseOrdered enrolled
2018-03-06SenatePassed; YEAS 36 NAYS 0 768
2018-03-06SenateRead 3rd time
2018-03-05SenatePlaced on 3rd reading
2018-03-05SenateRead 2nd time
2018-03-05SenateSubstituted for CS/SB 522
2018-03-05SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2018-03-05SenateWithdrawn from Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; Judiciary; Rules
2018-02-08SenateReceived
2018-02-08SenateReferred to Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; Judiciary; Rules
2018-02-07SenateIn Messages
2018-01-31HousePassed as amended; YEAS 112 NAYS 0
2018-01-31HouseRead 3rd time
2018-01-31HouseAmendment(s) adopted (791755)
2018-01-31HouseRead 2nd time
2018-01-25HousePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 01/31/18
2018-01-18HousePlaced on Calendar
2018-01-18HouseFavorable by- Health and Human Services Committee; YEAS 18 NAYS 0
2018-01-16HouseOn Committee agenda-- Health and Human Services Committee, 01/18/18, 8:00 am, Morris Hall
2018-01-09HouseNow in Health and Human Services Committee
2018-01-09HouseFavorable by Appropriations Committee; YEAS 29 NAYS 0
2018-01-09HouseIntroduced
2018-01-05HouseOn Committee agenda-- Appropriations Committee, 01/09/18, 4:30 pm, Webster Hall
2017-11-08HouseNow in Appropriations Committee
2017-11-08HouseFavorable by Children, Families and Seniors Subcommittee; YEAS 14 NAYS 0
2017-11-01HouseOn Committee agenda-- Children, Families and Seniors Subcommittee, 11/08/17, 1:30 pm, 12 HOB
2017-10-18HouseReferred to Children, Families and Seniors Subcommittee; Appropriations Committee; Health and Human Services Committee
2017-10-10HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S522 (Same As) 2018-03-05 - Laid on Table, refer to HB 281

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
396021Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback