FL H0279 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-01 - Chapter No. 2020-154
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Revising disclosure requirements for bidding documents and other requests for proposals issued for bids by a local governmental entity and public contracts entered into between local governmental entities and contractors; requiring that a local government that performs projects using its own services, employees, and equipment provide a report to the local governing board with certain information, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Local Government Public Construction Works

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-12 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#3 (Y: 36 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-09 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#611 (Y: 114 N: 1 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-07-01 Chapter No. 2020-154
2020-06-30 Approved by Governor
2020-06-17 Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
2020-03-12HouseOrdered enrolled
2020-03-12SenateCS passed; YEAS 36 NAYS 1
2020-03-12SenateRead 3rd time
2020-03-11SenatePlaced on 3rd reading
2020-03-11SenateRead 2nd time
2020-03-11SenateSubstituted for CS/CS/SB 504
2020-03-11SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2020-03-11SenateWithdrawn from Community Affairs; Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Rules
2020-03-09SenateReceived
2020-03-09SenateReferred to Community Affairs; Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Rules
2020-03-09SenateIn Messages
2020-03-09HouseCS passed as amended; YEAS 114 NAYS 1
2020-03-09HouseRead 3rd time
2020-03-06HousePlaced on 3rd reading
2020-03-06HouseAmendment(s) adopted (217229) 896
2020-03-06HouseRead 2nd time
2020-03-03HousePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 03/06/20
2020-03-02HouseCS/CS by State Affairs Committee read 1st time
2020-03-02HousePlaced on Calendar
2020-02-28HousePending review of CS -under Rule 7.18(c)
2020-02-27HouseCS/CS by- State Affairs Committee; YEAS 21 NAYS 0
2020-02-25HouseOn Committee agenda-- State Affairs Committee, 02/27/20, 8:00 am, Morris Hall
2020-02-04HouseNow in State Affairs Committee
2020-02-04HouseFavorable by Business and Professions Subcommittee; YEAS 8 NAYS 2
2020-01-31HouseOn Committee agenda-- Business and Professions Subcommittee, 02/04/20, 12:00 pm, Webster Hall
2020-01-30HouseNow in Business and Professions Subcommittee
2020-01-29HouseCS by Oversight, Transparency and Public Management Subcommittee read 1st time
2020-01-29HousePending review of CS under Rule 7.18(c)
2020-01-29HouseCS by Oversight, Transparency and Public Management Subcommittee; YEAS 11 NAYS 3
2020-01-27HouseOn Committee agenda-- Oversight, Transparency and Public Management Subcommittee, 01/29/20, 8:00 am, Morris Hall
2020-01-14HouseIntroduced
2019-10-14HouseReferred to Oversight, Transparency and Public Management Subcommittee; Business and Professions Subcommittee; State Affairs Committee
2019-10-02HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S504 (Similar To) 2020-03-11 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/CS/HB 279

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
21880Amended CodeSee Bill Text
25520Amended CodeSee Bill Text
33641Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback