FL H0277 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on October 13 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-03 - Laid on Table, refer to SB 638
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on October 13 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-03 - Laid on Table, refer to SB 638
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Extends expiration date of Early Childhood Music Education Incentive Pilot Program.
Title
Early Childhood Music Education Incentive Pilot Program
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-17 - House - House Education & Employment Committee (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-08 - House - House PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-02 - House - House Early Learning & Elementary Education Subcommittee (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-08 - House - House PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-02 - House - House Early Learning & Elementary Education Subcommittee (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-03 | House | Laid on Table, refer to SB 638 |
2022-03-03 | House | Substituted SB 638 |
2022-02-28 | House | Bill added to Special Order Calendar (3/3/2022) |
2022-02-17 | House | Added to Second Reading Calendar |
2022-02-17 | House | Bill released to House Calendar |
2022-02-17 | House | Reported out of Education & Employment Committee |
2022-02-17 | House | Favorable by Education & Employment Committee |
2022-02-15 | House | Added to Education & Employment Committee agenda |
2022-02-08 | House | Now in Education & Employment Committee |
2022-02-08 | House | Reported out of PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee |
2022-02-08 | House | Favorable by PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee |
2022-02-04 | House | Added to PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee agenda |
2022-02-02 | House | Now in PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee |
2022-02-02 | House | Reported out of Early Learning & Elementary Education Subcommittee |
2022-02-02 | House | Favorable by Early Learning & Elementary Education Subcommittee |
2022-01-31 | House | Added to Early Learning & Elementary Education Subcommittee agenda |
2022-01-11 | House | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) |
2021-10-22 | House | Now in Early Learning & Elementary Education Subcommittee |
2021-10-22 | House | Referred to Education & Employment Committee |
2021-10-22 | House | Referred to PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee |
2021-10-22 | House | Referred to Early Learning & Elementary Education Subcommittee |
2021-10-13 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S638 (Same As) 2022-05-06 - Chapter No. 2022-94