FL H0277 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Oversight, Transparency and Administration Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Removes designations of birthdays of Robert E. Lee & Jefferson Davis & Confederate Memorial Day as legal holidays.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Legal Holidays

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-10HouseDied in Oversight, Transparency and Administration Subcommittee
2018-03-10HouseIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2018-01-09HouseIntroduced
2017-10-18HouseReferred to Oversight, Transparency and Administration Subcommittee; Government Accountability Committee
2017-10-10HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S224 (Same As) 2018-03-10 - Died in Governmental Oversight and Accountability
S214 (Similar To) 2017-08-25 - Withdrawn prior to introduction

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
68301Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback