FL H0273 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 15 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-04-26 - Laid on Table, Refer to CS/SB 420, 1st Eng.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Provides private passenger motor vehicle policies may exclude certain identified individuals from specified coverages; provides such policies may not exclude coverage under certain circumstances; requires identified individual to meet certain requirements for financial responsibility; provides exclusion remains valid under specified circumstances.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Motor Vehicle Insurance Coverage Exclusions

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-19 - House - House Commerce Committee (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-04 - House - House Insurance & Banking Subcommittee (Y: 12 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-26HouseLaid on Table, Refer to CS/SB 420, 1st Eng.
2021-04-22HouseAdded to Second Reading Calendar
2021-04-22HouseBill referred to House Calendar
2021-04-20House1st Reading (Committee Substitute 2)
2021-04-20HouseCS Filed
2021-04-20HouseLaid on Table under Rule 7.18(a)
2021-04-20HouseReported out of Commerce Committee
2021-04-19HouseFavorable with CS by Commerce Committee
2021-04-18HouseAdded to Commerce Committee agenda
2021-04-18HouseAdded to Commerce Committee agenda
2021-03-25HouseAdded to Commerce Committee agenda
2021-03-08HouseNow in Commerce Committee
2021-03-08HouseReferred to Commerce Committee
2021-03-04House1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1)
2021-03-04HouseCS Filed
2021-03-04HouseLaid on Table under Rule 7.18(a)
2021-03-04HouseReported out of Insurance & Banking Subcommittee
2021-03-04HouseFavorable with CS by Insurance & Banking Subcommittee
2021-03-02House1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
2021-03-02HouseAdded to Insurance & Banking Subcommittee agenda
2021-02-03HouseNow in Insurance & Banking Subcommittee
2021-02-03HouseReferred to Commerce Committee
2021-02-03HouseReferred to Insurance & Banking Subcommittee
2021-01-15HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S420 (Same As) 2021-06-14 - Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
S54 (Similar To) 2021-04-30 - Message sent to senate
H719 (Similar To) 2021-04-23 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/CS/SB 54

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
324151Amended CodeSee Bill Text
627736Amended CodeSee Bill Text
6277407Amended CodeSee Bill Text
627747Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/273
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/273/BillText/Filed/PDF
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/273/BillText/c1/PDF
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/273/BillText/c2/PDF
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/273/Amendment/747559/PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/273/Analyses/h0273.IBS.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/273/Analyses/h0273a.IBS.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/273/Analyses/h0273b.COM.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/273/Analyses/h0273c.COM.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/273/Analyses/h0273z.IBS.PDF
Roll Callhttps://www.myfloridahouse.gov/Sections/Committees/billvote.aspx?VoteId=57417&IsPCB=0&BillId=70384
Roll Callhttps://www.myfloridahouse.gov/Sections/Committees/billvote.aspx?VoteId=60526&IsPCB=0&BillId=70384

Bill Comments 750

feedback