FL H0271 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Health Quality Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Prohibits termination of pregnancy if physician determines that preborn human being has detectable preborn intrauterine heartbeat; removes medical necessity exceptions; revises certain informed consent requirements; removes provisions relating to partial-birth abortions; removes certain civil remedies; provides criminal penalties.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Abortion

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-14HouseDied in Health Quality Subcommittee
2020-03-14HouseIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2020-01-14HouseIntroduced
2019-10-14HouseReferred to Health Quality Subcommittee; Judiciary Committee; Health and Human Services Committee
2019-10-01HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

H6047 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Health Quality Subcommittee

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
390011Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3900111Amended CodeSee Bill Text
39001112Amended CodeSee Bill Text
390012Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback