FL H0269 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Roads, Bridges, & Ports Policy (EDCA)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Roads, Bridges, & Ports Policy (EDCA)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creates exemption from tax on sales, use, & other transactions for leases of passenger vehicles for commuting purposes; defines term "vanpool lease."
Title
Vanpools
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-30 | Died in Committee on Roads, Bridges, & Ports Policy (EDCA) | |
2010-03-02 | Introduced, referred to Roads, Bridges, & Ports Policy (EDCA); Finance & Tax Council; Economic Development & Community Affairs Policy Council -HJ 00030 | |
2009-11-13 | Referred to Roads, Bridges, & Ports Policy (EDCA); Finance & Tax Council; Economic Development & Community Affairs Policy Council | |
2009-10-26 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S0236 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Transportation