FL H0267 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on October 1 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-10-22 - Placed on Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Expands existing public records exemption to include information identifying pregnant minor that is contained in court records relating to such minor's petition to waive consent requirements to obtain abortion; provides for future legislative review & repeal of expanded exemption; provides for reversion of specified language if exemption is not saved from repeal; provides statement of public necessity.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Pub. Rec./Abortion

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-10-22HousePlaced on Calendar
2019-10-22HouseFavorable by- Health and Human Services Committee; YEAS 18 NAYS 0
2019-10-15HouseOn Committee agenda-- Health and Human Services Committee, 10/22/19, 1:00 pm, Morris Hall
2019-10-10HouseReferred to Health and Human Services Committee
2019-10-01HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

H265 (Related) 2019-10-22 - Placed on Calendar
S406 (Similar To) 2019-11-05 - On Committee agenda-- Health Policy, 11/12/19, 10:30 am, 412 Knott Building --Not Considered

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
39001116Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback